Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Riviera

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1671BornUrbino, Italy
2 Mar 173361.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Mar 173361.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 173361.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
2 Jan 174169.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
2 Nov 175280.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

MicroData Summary for Domenico Riviera:
Domenico Cardinal Riviera (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

  • a priest for 19.6 years
  • a cardinal for 19.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1733

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015