Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Rivarola

Deceased

Priest of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1758BornGenoa
1 Oct 181759.5Elevated to Cardinal
1 Oct 181759.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
12 Oct 181961.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 Oct 182365.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 182668.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
7 Nov 184284.6DiedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Rivarola:
Agostino Cardinal Rivarola (born , died ) Priest of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 19.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • c0: CB, 8 Apr 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014