Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Maria Cardinal Riminaldi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1718BornFerrara, Italy
14 Feb 178566.4Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178566.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
29 Jan 178970.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
12 Oct 178971.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Riminaldi:
Cardinal Giovanni Maria Riminaldi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

  • a cardinal for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013