Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Ricci

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1572AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
9 May 1575AppointedBishop of Gravina (di Puglia), Italy
13 Nov 1581AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
3 Jul 1592DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Ricci:
Bishop Giulio Ricci (died ) Bishop of Teramo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013