Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Riario Sforza

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1782BornNaples, Italy
10 Mar 182341.2Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 182341.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
28 Sep 182341.7Ordained PriestPriest of the Roman Curia - Other
17 Nov 182341.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
19 Dec 183452.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
13 May 183755.3ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
3 Apr 184361.2AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
14 Mar 185775.2DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Riario Sforza:
Cardinal Tommaso Riario Sforza (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a cardinal for 34.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013