Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ruprecht von Rhein

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1427Born
30 Mar 146336.0SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 May 146437.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
10 Apr 146841.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Jul 148053.3DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ruprecht von Rhein (VIAF: 5851946)
Archbishop Ruprecht von Rhein (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018