Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann bei Rhein

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1488Born
27 Oct 150719.4AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Feb 153849.7DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann bei Rhein
Bishop Johann bei Rhein (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast