Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Rezzi (Resti)

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1609AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
9 Jul 1614AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
8 Aug 1639AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
Mar 1648²DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Rezzi (Resti):
Bishop Michael Rezzi (Resti) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 96, and Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013