Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Resta

Deceased

Bishop of Tortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1657³Born
3 Nov 169740.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 170143.5AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
6 Mar 170143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tortona, Italy
11 Jan 174385.4DiedBishop of Tortona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Resta
Bishop Giulio Resta (born , died ) Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 183
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,683
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 31
  • ~c2: AT, 17 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 17 Oct 2020

Quantcast