Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph Reiners, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Nagoya, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1874Born
15 Aug 189824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Nov 191238.6AppointedPrefect of Niigata, Japan
28 Jun 192652.2AppointedPrefect of Nagoya, Japan
194166.7ResignedPrefect of Nagoya, Japan
28 Aug 194571.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Nagoya, Japan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Reiners
Father Joseph Reiners S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Nagoya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuwerk, Germany

  • a priest for 47.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • d: CB, 3 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast