Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Reid, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Apr 1541SelectedBishop of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain
20 Jul 1541ConfirmedBishop of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain
27 Nov 1541Ordained BishopBishop of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain
6 Sep 1558DiedBishop of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Reid
Bishop Robert Reid O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Orkney (Kirkwall)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAitkenhead
Ordained BishopEdinburgh, Archdiocese of Saint Andrews, Scotland

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1541, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast