Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Weigand von Redwitz

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1476Born
18 Jun 152246.4SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
7 Jan 152347.0ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
30 Aug 152347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
20 May 155680.3DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Weigand von Redwitz
Bishop Weigand von Redwitz (born 1476, died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTüschnitz

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,814
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast