Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Ikataere Rarikin, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Superior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1944Born
2 Mar 196622.1ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
30 Sep 197228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
24 Sep 201066.7AppointedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Jan 201167.0InstalledSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Feb 201470.0DiedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for John Ikataere Rarikin
Father John Ikataere Rarikin M.S.C. (born , died ) Superior of Funafuti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaoku

  • a priest for 41.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 1,069
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast