Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Balthasar Rantzau

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497Born
30 Jun 153639.4SelectedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
22 Dec 153639.9ConfirmedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
23 May 154750.3DiedBishop-Elect of Lübeck, Germany

MicroData Summary for Balthasar Rantzau (VIAF: 100415329)
Father Balthasar Rantzau (born 1497, died ) Bishop-Elect of Lübeck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWindeby

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 31*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018