Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Rampini

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1390¹Born
10 May 141323.3AppointedBishop of Tortona, Italy
7 Jun 143545.4AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
27 Aug 144353.6AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Dec 144656.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 144656.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
4 Jul 145060.5DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Rampini
Enrico Cardinal Rampini (born 1390, died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortona

  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1446

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018