Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domingo Cardinal Ram i Lanaja, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1345¹BornAlcañiz
5 May 141065.3AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
13 Nov 141570.8AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
23 Jul 142378.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
10 Mar 143085.1AppointedAdministrator of Lérida, Spain
8 Nov 143085.8Elevated to Cardinal
8 Nov 1430³85.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
24 Mar 143489.2AppointedAdministrator of Tarragona, Spain
20 Jul 143590.5ResignedAdministrator of Lérida, Spain
4 Jul 144095.5AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
7 Mar 144499.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
25 Apr 1445100.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Ram i Lanaja:
Domingo Cardinal Ram i Lanaja C.R.S.A. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 21.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jul 1423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015