Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo , O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1349AppointedBishop of Civita (Tempio), Italy
10 Jun 1351AppointedBishop of Mariana, France
1352²DiedBishop of Mariana, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo
Bishop Raimondo O.P. (died 1352) Bishop of Mariana

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 325, and Page 188
  • b: CB, 18 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast