Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ramírez de Guzmán

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1500AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
26 Jun 1500AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
23 Oct 1508DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Ramírez de Guzmán
Bishop Diego Ramírez de Guzmán (died ) Bishop of Catania

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 17, Number 4
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,500, Number 20*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 181, and Page 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast