Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edouard Gabriel Quint, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1905BornStiring Wendel, France
16 Sep 192318.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
13 Nov 192924.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Jul 193025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jan 195044.8AppointedPrefect of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China
1959¹53.8ResignedPrefect of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China
20 May 199489.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edouard Gabriel Quint
Father Edouard Gabriel Quint O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Weihai [Weihaiwei]

  • a priest for 63.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 28 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 31 Mar 2016