Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Puteo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1495BornMallorca
18 Apr 155055.2AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
20 Nov 155156.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155156.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
29 May 155560.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
16 Dec 156267.8ResignedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
26 Apr 156368.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Puteo:
Cardinal Giacomo Puteo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013