Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Przerębski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
13 May 155848.3AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
4 Nov 155848.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Feb 155949.1SucceededArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
12 Jan 156252.0DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Przerębski
Archbishop Jan Przerębski (born 1510, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast