Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wincenty Przerębski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
22 Oct 149848.8AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
1499²49.0Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
29 Nov 150353.9AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
20 Sep 151363.7DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wincenty Przerębski:
Bishop Wincenty Przerębski (died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 217
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013