Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal de Primis, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Administrator of Catania


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Dec 1446AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
16 Dec 1446Elevated to Cardinal
3 Feb 1447AppointedAdministrator of Catania, Italy
21 Jan 1449DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Primis
Giovanni Cardinal de Primis O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a cardinal for 2.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1446
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast