Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Prigent

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1436AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
27 Feb 1439AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
25 Apr 1450AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
15 Jul 1450AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
1471¹DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Prigent
Bishop Jean Prigent (died 1471) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175, and Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 29*
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 616

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast