Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Myles Prendergast, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Verapoly

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1775¹BornIreland
8 Dec 179520.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Carmelites
9 Dec 179520.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
18 Sep 181843.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
18 Sep 181843.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
Oct 1818²43.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
5 May 182752.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Verapoly, India
1844¹69.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Verapoly, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Myles Prendergast
Bishop Myles Prendergast O.C.D. (born 1775, died 1844) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Verapoly

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016