Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wesceslau Nazareno Ponti, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Alto Solimões, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Cea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1880²BornSpoleto
8 Nov 194666.9AppointedPrefect of Alto Solimões, Brazil
4 Sep 195070.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
26 Apr 195272.3AppointedPrelate of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil
26 Apr 195272.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cea
29 Jun 195272.5DiedBishop-Elect of Alto Solimões, Amazonas, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wesceslau Nazareno Ponti:
Priest Wesceslau Nazareno Ponti O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Bishop-Elect of Alto Solimões

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013