Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Portico

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1553AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
19 Sep 1555AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Foligno, Italy
27 Feb 1556DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Portico
Archbishop Sebastiano Portico (died ) Bishop of Foligno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199, and Page 281
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast