Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigfried Piscator, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1411Born
7 Mar 144635.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
7 Mar 144635.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
Sep 145544.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Mar 146251.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
16 Oct 147362.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigfried Piscator
Bishop Sigfried Piscator O.P. (born 1411, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast