Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Umberto Cardinal da Pirovano

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1160¹Born
May 1206³46.3Elevated to Cardinal
May 1206³46.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
11 Dec 120646.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Apr 120747.2InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
13 Mar 121151.1DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Umberto da Pirovano
Umberto Cardinal da Pirovano (born 1160, died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrianza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a cardinal for 4.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1205
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 332
  • 1a04: AM, 25 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 May 2020

Quantcast