Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John P’ing Ta-kuam, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Jinan [Tsinan], China


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1952AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jinan [Tsinan], China
3 Feb 1984DiedApostolic Administrator of Jinan [Tsinan], China

MicroData Summary for John P’ing Ta-kuam
Father John P’ing Ta-kuam O.F.M. (died ) Apostolic Administrator of Jinan [Tsinan]

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast