Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Maria Cardinal Pieri, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1676BornSiena, Italy
24 Mar 173457.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Apr 173457.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
27 Jan 174366.3DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Pieri:
Cardinal Pietro Maria Pieri O.S.M. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

  • a cardinal for 8.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1734

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013