Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionigi Pieragostini

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1676BornCamerino
20 Dec 169822.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172852.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricale
7 May 173256.2AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
8 Dec 174569.8DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Dionigi Pieragostini:
Bishop Dionigi Pieragostini (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 47.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013