Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Piédru (or Predou)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1430AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
25 Aug 1434AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
24 Nov 1449DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Piédru (or Predou)
Bishop Pierre Piédru (or Predou) (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 182, and Page 254
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast