Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Piccolomini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1458AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
16 Apr 1459Ordained BishopBishop of Siena, Italy
23 Apr 1459AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
8 Nov 1459DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Piccolomini:
Archbishop Antonio Piccolomini O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a bishop for .6 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,798
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 235
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013