Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enea Silvio Cardinal Piccolomini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1709BornSiena, Italy
26 Sep 176657.1Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176657.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
18 Nov 176859.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

MicroData Summary for Enea Silvio Piccolomini:
Cardinal Enea Silvio Piccolomini (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013