Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ascanio Piccolomini

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1579AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siena, Italy
3 Jul 1579AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae
11 Sep 1579Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae
1588²SucceededArchbishop of Siena, Italy
13 May 1597DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Piccolomini (VIAF: 31121410)
Archbishop Ascanio Piccolomini (died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pienza, Diocese of Pienza

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297, and Page 172
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast