Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Piccolomini

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Siena

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508¹Born
1555²47.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 157466.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siena, Italy
28 Jul 157466.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
12 Mar 157870.2DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Piccolomini:
Archbishop Alessandro Piccolomini (died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 23.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 271, and Page 297
  • d: CB, 24 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014