Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flaminio Cardinal Piatti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1552Born
6 Mar 159138.6Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 159138.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
9 Mar 159239.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
15 Mar 159340.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
10 Jun 159643.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
24 Apr 160047.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
1 Nov 161361.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

MicroData Summary for Flaminio Piatti
Flaminio Cardinal Piatti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 22.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast