Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Marco Petta, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1921Born
31 Oct 193615.7EnteredMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
10 Nov 193817.8Temporary VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
11 Nov 194120.8Solemn VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
21 Nov 194322.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
5 Apr 194423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
10 Aug 199473.5SelectedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
13 Sep 199473.6ConfirmedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
17 Jun 200079.4RetiredAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
26 Sep 200786.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Petta
Abbot Marco Petta O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiana degli Albanesi
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria di Grottaferrata, Abbey, Grottaferrata, Territorial Abbey of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 63.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast