Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Michele Petruzzelli, O.S.B.

Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1961 Born
21 Nov 198726.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1990²28.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Aug 199837.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Dec 201352.3AppointedAbbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Petruzzelli
Abbot Michele Petruzzelli O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Santissima Trinità di Cava de’ Tirreni.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast