Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Perrelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1696BornNaples, Italy
24 Sep 175962.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175963.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
24 Feb 177275.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

MicroData Summary for Nicola Perrelli:
Cardinal Nicola Perrelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

  • a cardinal for 12.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013