Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Perosi

Deceased

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1868Born
8 Nov 189122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tortona, Italy
7 Dec 191142.9AppointedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
8 Dec 191647.9ResignedRegent of the Apostolic Penitentiary
21 Jun 192657.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 192657.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
10 Feb 192859.1AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
1 Nov 192859.8AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
22 Feb 193061.1DiedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

MicroData Summary for Carlo Perosi
Carlo Cardinal Perosi (born , died ) Secretary of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTortona, Diocese of Tortona, Italy

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast