Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Pérez de Ayala

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1503Born
16 May 154844.5AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 Sep 154844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
30 May 154945.5InstalledBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 Jul 156056.6AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
12 Jul 156157.6InstalledBishop of Segovia, Spain
6 Sep 156460.8AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
23 Apr 156561.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
5 Aug 156662.7DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Pérez de Ayala (VIAF: 49369593)
Archbishop Martín Pérez de Ayala (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegura de la Sierra, Diocese of Jaén
Ordained BishopS. Ambroise, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 60, Number 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 325
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Oct 2017