Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pérez Roya

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1638AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
3 Aug 1643AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Apr 1648DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pérez Roya
Bishop Francisco Pérez Roya (died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCubel de Gandía

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182, and Page 198
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 166, Number 1,040
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast