Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leone da Perego, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1241SelectedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jan 1244ConfirmedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
15 Apr 1245Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Oct 1257DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Leone da Perego:
Archbishop Leone da Perego O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013