Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Gregorio de Montelungo

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1190¹Born
19 Feb 124959.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
29 Nov 125161.9AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
Aug 1256³66.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
8 Sep 126979.6DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Gregorio de Montelungo
Patriarch Gregorio de Montelungo (born 1190, died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

  • a bishop for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 498, and Page 99
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 May 2019

Quantcast