Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guido Cardinal Pepoli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1560BornBologna, Italy
20 Dec 158929.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 159029.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
6 Feb 159231.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
12 Jun 159535.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello
8 Jan 159635.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
Jun 159939.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio

MicroData Summary for Guido Pepoli:
Cardinal Guido Pepoli (born ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio

  • a cardinal for 9.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1589

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013