Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvestro Pepe

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1724BornNapoli
23 Dec 174723.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 175935.0AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
8 Apr 175935.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
23 Jun 180379.2DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Pepe:
Archbishop Silvestro Pepe (born , died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1792
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015