Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Pentini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1797Born
16 Mar 186365.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 186365.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
17 Dec 186972.0DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pentini
Francesco Cardinal Pentini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast