Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Pennarius, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Oct 1557AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
6 Oct 1557AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
13 Feb 1558Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
11 Sep 1563DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Pennarius
Bishop Johann Pennarius O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuss
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Death PlaceMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018